Global Patent Index - EP 2021437 A2

EP 2021437 A2 2009-02-11 - A HEAT RECYCLING SYSTEM FOR USE WITH A GASIFIER

Title (en)

A HEAT RECYCLING SYSTEM FOR USE WITH A GASIFIER

Title (de)

WÄRMERÜCKFÜHRUNGSSYSTEM ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT EINEM VERGASER

Title (fr)

SYSTÈME DE RECYCLAGE DE CHALEUR DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ AVEC UN GAZÉIFIEUR

Publication

EP 2021437 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07783408 A

Priority

  • US 2007068398 W
  • US 79797306 P
  • US 74661206 P
  • CA 2006000881 W
  • US 86411606 P
  • US 91117907 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131235A2] The present invention provides a system that recycles heat recovered from hot products of a carbonaceous feedstock gasification process back into the gasification process. The hot gaseous products are used to heat working fluids such as air and water to produce hot air, hot water or steam. The heated fluids are used to return heat back to the gasification process. The system also comprises a control system to optimize the efficiency of a gasification process by minimizing energy consumption of the process, while also maximizing energy production.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/00 (2006.01); C01B 3/36 (2006.01); C10J 1/207 (2012.01); C10J 3/46 (2006.01); C10J 3/54 (2006.01); C10K 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/027 (2013.01); C10J 3/002 (2013.01); C10J 3/24 (2013.01); C10J 3/48 (2013.01); C10J 3/723 (2013.01); C10J 3/82 (2013.01); F23G 5/46 (2013.01); F23G 5/50 (2013.01); C10J 2200/09 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1869 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1884 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1892 (2013.01); F23G 2206/10 (2013.01); Y02E 20/12 (2013.01); Y02P 20/13 (2015.11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007131235 A2 20071115; WO 2007131235 A3 20080731; AU 2007247894 A1 20071115; AU 2007247894 A2 20090115; BR PI0712298 A2 20120313; EA 200802255 A1 20091030; EP 2021437 A2 20090211; EP 2021437 A4 20101006; JP 2009536259 A 20091008; KR 20090036546 A 20090414; MX 2008014166 A 20090127; US 2007284453 A1 20071213

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121201

2012-08-08 [D11X] LEGAL MEANS OF EXECUTION (DELETED)

2010-10-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100902

2009-08-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-05-20 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

- Effective date: 20090402

2009-04-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PLASCOENERGY IP HOLDINGS, S.L., BILBAO, SCHAFFHAUS

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081127

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS