Global Patent Index - EP 2021438 A2

EP 2021438 A2 2009-02-11 - MICROREACTOR PROCESS FOR MAKING BIODIESEL

Title (en)

MICROREACTOR PROCESS FOR MAKING BIODIESEL

Title (de)

MIKROREAKTORVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BIODIESEL

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE MICRORÉACTEUR POUR FABRIQUER DU BIODIÉSEL

Publication

EP 2021438 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07795499 A

Priority

  • US 2007012763 W
  • US 81056906 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007142983A2] Embodiments of a method for using a microreactor to produce biodiesel. For example, the method may comprise flowing a first fluid comprising an alcohol and a second fluid comprising an oil to the microreactor. Alcohols typically, but not necessarily, are lower aliphatic alcohols, including methanol, ethanol, propanol, butanol, amyl alcohol or combinations thereof. Biodiesel production can be under supercritical conditions, where such conditions typically are determined relative to the alcohol component. Suitable sources of oil products include soy, inedible tallow and grease, corn, edible tallow and lard, cotton, rapeseed, sunflower, canola, peanut, safflower, and combinations thereof. Catalysts can be used to facilitate biodiesel production, such as metal oxides, metal hydroxides, metal carbonates, alcoholic metal carbonates, alkoxides, mineral acids and enzymes. Oil conversion to biodiesel typically increases with increasing mean microreactor residence time. Certain embodiments of the present invention include blending biodiesel produced by the method with petroleum-based products.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/18 (2006.01); B01J 19/00 (2006.01); C10L 1/02 (2006.01); C11C 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 19/0093 (2013.01); C10L 1/026 (2013.01); C10L 1/19 (2013.01); C11C 3/003 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00783 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00788 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00835 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00837 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00844 (2013.01); B01J 2219/0086 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00891 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00905 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00907 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00959 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00984 (2013.01); C10G 2300/1011 (2013.01); Y02E 50/13 (2013.01); Y02P 30/20 (2015.11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007142983 A2 20071213; WO 2007142983 A3 20080124; EP 2021438 A2 20090211; EP 2021438 A4 20100929; US 2009165366 A1 20090702

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110401

2010-09-29 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 1/18 20060101AFI20080221BHEP

2010-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10L 1/02 20060101ALI20100810BHEP

2010-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C11C 3/00 20060101ALI20100810BHEP

2010-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B01J 19/00 20060101ALI20100810BHEP

2009-09-09 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-09-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JOVANOVIC, GORAN, NADEZDA

2009-09-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PAUL, BRIAN, KEVIN

2009-09-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PARKER, JAMES

2009-09-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AL-DHUBABIAN, AHMAD

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS