Global Patent Index - EP 2021482 A1

EP 2021482 A1 2009-02-11 - TREATMENT OF AN INFECTION BY AN RNA VIRUS DUE TO AN RNA DEPENDENT RNA POLYMERASE

Title (en)

TREATMENT OF AN INFECTION BY AN RNA VIRUS DUE TO AN RNA DEPENDENT RNA POLYMERASE

Title (de)

BEHANDLUNG EINER INFEKTION DURCH RNA-VIRUS AUFGRUND EINER RNA-BEDINGTEN RNA-POLYMERASE

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENT D'UNE INFECTION PAR UN VIRUS À ARN À UNE ARN POLYMÉRASE ARN DÉPENDANTE

Publication

EP 2021482 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07765973 A

Priority

  • FR 2007000899 W
  • FR 0604806 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007138193A1] The present invention concerns a simple RNA strand, which includes, from extremity 3' to extremity 5', (i) a sequence of complementary nucleic acid to the non-coding region 5' (5'UTR) of the genomic RNA (strand (+) ) of the hepatitis C virus (VHC) or another RNA virus replicating thanks to an RNA dependent RNA polymerase, the nucleic acid sequence of which allows the replication of said simple RNA strand molecule by the replication complex of said virus, (ii) the complementary nucleic acid sequence of a corresponding nucleic acid sequence from the site of internal entry of the ribosome (1RES), and (iii) the complementary nucleic acid sequence of a suicide gene or a coding gene for a protein interfering with the replication of the VHC virus or another RNA virus replicating thanks to an RNA dependent RNA polymerase; an ADN molecule allowing the transcription of said simple RNA strand molecule; a vector of nucleic acids including said molecules of nucleic acids; and a pharmaceutical compound including said molecules of nucleic acids or said vector of nucleic acid.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/86 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/86 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2770/24243 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007138193A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

FR 2901807 A1 20071207; FR 2901807 B1 20130823; CA 2653910 A1 20071206; EP 2021482 A1 20090211; JP 2009538610 A 20091112; JP 5301433 B2 20130925; US 2011015255 A1 20110120; WO 2007138193 A1 20071206; WO 2007138193 A8 20090716

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150630

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-12-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSITE BORDEAUX SEGALEN

2011-12-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS

2009-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090326

2009-04-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSITE VICTOR SEGALEN BORDEAUX 2

2009-04-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VENTURA, MICHEL

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ASTIER-GIN, THERESE

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LITVAK, SIMON

2009-04-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DUMAS, ESTELLE

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081128

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS