Global Patent Index - EP 2021487 A2

EP 2021487 A2 2009-02-11 - THERMOPHILIC ORGANISMS FOR CONVERSION OF LIGNOCELLULOSIC BIOMASS TO ETHANOL

Title (en)

THERMOPHILIC ORGANISMS FOR CONVERSION OF LIGNOCELLULOSIC BIOMASS TO ETHANOL

Title (de)

THERMOPHILE ORGANISMEN ZUR UMWANDLUNG VON LIGNOZELLULOSE-BIOMASSE IN ETHANOL

Title (fr)

ORGANISMES THERMOPHILES POUR LA CONVERSION DE BIOMASSE LIGNO-CELLULOSIQUE EN ETHANOL

Publication

EP 2021487 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07783037 A

Priority

  • US 2007067941 W
  • US 79638006 P
  • US 2006042442 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP2397556A1] Mutant thermophilic organisms that consume a variety of biomass derived substrates are disclosed herein. Strains of Thermoanaerobacterium saccharolyticum with acetate kinase and phosphotransacetylase expression eliminated are disclosed herein. Further, strain ALK1 has been engineered by site directed homologous recombination to knockout both acetic acid and lactic acid production. Continuous culture involving a substrate concentration challenge lead to evolution of ALK1, and formation of a more robust strain designated ALK2. The organisms may be utilized for example in thermophilic SSF and SSCF reactions performed at temperatures that are optimal for cellulase activity to produce near theoretical ethanol yields without expressing pyruvate decarboxylase.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12P 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/1029 (2013.01); C12N 9/0006 (2013.01); C12N 9/1217 (2013.01); C12P 7/10 (2013.01); C12R 1/145 (2013.01); C12Y 203/01008 (2013.01); C12Y 207/02001 (2013.01); Y02E 50/16 (2013.01); Y02E 50/17 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007130984A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2397556 A1 20111221; AU 2007248091 A1 20071115; BR PI0709758 A2 20110726; CA 2651011 A1 20071115; CN 101868548 A 20101020; EP 2021487 A2 20090211; JP 2010504734 A 20100218; ZA 200809352 B 20090826

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20131203

2009-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090813

2009-08-05 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHAW, ARTHUR JOSEPHUS

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DESAI, SUNIL G.

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LYND, LEE R.

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TYURIN, MIKHAIL V.

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PODKAMINER, KARA

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BARDSLEY, JOHN

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOGSETT, DAVID ANTHONY

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081128

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS