Global Patent Index - EP 2021499 A2

EP 2021499 A2 2009-02-11 - FUNCTIONAL ARRAYS FOR HIGH THROUGHPUT CHARACTERIZATION OF GENE EXPRESSION REGULATORY ELEMENTS

Title (en)

FUNCTIONAL ARRAYS FOR HIGH THROUGHPUT CHARACTERIZATION OF GENE EXPRESSION REGULATORY ELEMENTS

Title (de)

FUNKTIONELLE ARRAYS ZUR KENNZEICHNUNG VON ELEMENTEN ZUR GENEXPRESSIONSREGULIERUNG MIT HOHEM DURCHSATZ

Title (fr)

RESEAUX FONCTIONNELS POUR LA CARACTERISATION A GRANDE CADENCE D'ELEMENTS REGULANT L'EXPRESSION GENIQUE

Publication

EP 2021499 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06849046 A

Priority

  • US 2006046920 W
  • US 75092905 P
  • US 76205606 P
  • US 63638506 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007078599A2] The present invention provides compositions, kits, assemblies, libraries, arrays, and high throughput methods for large scale structural and functional characterization of gene expression regulatory elements in a genome of an organism, especially in a human genome. In one aspect of the invention, an array of expression constructs is provided, e.ach of the expression constructs comprising: a nucleic acid segment operably linked with a reporter sequence in an expression vector such that expression of the reporter sequence is under the transcriptional control of the nucleic acid segment, the nucleic acid segment varying in the library and having a diversity of at least 50. The nucleic acid segments can be a large library of gene expression regulatory elements such as transcriptional promoters. The present invention can have a wide variety of applications such as in personalized medicine, pharmacogenomics, and correlation of polymorphisms with phenotypic traits.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); C12N 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/1086 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6897 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007078599 A2 20070712; WO 2007078599 A3 20080828; WO 2007078599 A8 20081030; WO 2007078599 A9 20071004; EP 2021499 A2 20090211; EP 2021499 A4 20100217; JP 2009519710 A 20090521

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-24 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20120618

2012-07-11 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2012-06-18 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2010-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100421

2010-02-17 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100115

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080715

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS