Global Patent Index - EP 2021509 A2

EP 2021509 A2 2009-02-11 - PROCEDURE AND METHODS FOR DETECTING ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE

Title (en)

PROCEDURE AND METHODS FOR DETECTING ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE

Title (de)

VORGEHENSWEISE UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEN NACHWEIS VON MORBUS ALZHEIMER

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ ET MÉTHODES DE DÉTECTION DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER

Publication

EP 2021509 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 07766039 A

Priority

  • FR 2007051263 W
  • FR 0604294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007132120A2] This application concerns methods and compositions that can be used for detecting the Alzheimer disease in mammals, particularly in humans. It describes in particular serum markers for Alzheimer's disease and the way they are used for diagnostic procedures. It also concerns tools and/or kits that can be used for applying these procedures (reagents, probes, primers, antibodies, chips, cells, etc.) with the preparation thereof and the way to use them. The invention can be used to detect the presence or the progression of Alzheimer illness in mammals, including at early stages of the disease.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6883 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6806 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/158 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007132120A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

FR 2900936 A1 20071116; FR 2900936 B1 20130104; AU 2007251408 A1 20071122; AU 2007251408 B2 20121129; CA 2652258 A1 20071122; CN 101490280 A 20090722; CN 101490280 B 20120926; EP 2021509 A2 20090211; FR 2980484 A1 20130329; IL 195288 A 20131031; IL 195288 D0 20090803; JP 2009537133 A 20091029; KR 20090098941 A 20090918; NZ 573505 A 20110429; US 2010055682 A1 20100304; WO 2007132120 A2 20071122; WO 2007132120 A3 20080508; ZA 200810528 B 20091028

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140409

2013-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIAXONHIT

2011-07-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXONHIT SA

2010-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100304

2010-03-03 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20080508

2009-08-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081211

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS