Global Patent Index - EP 2021520 A1

EP 2021520 A1 2009-02-11 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING STABILISED METAL NANOPARTICLES

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCING STABILISED METAL NANOPARTICLES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON STABILISIERTEN METALLNANOTEILCHEN

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE NANOPARTICULES MÉTALLIQUES STABILISÉES

Publication

EP 2021520 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07733702 A

Priority

  • GB 2007050281 W
  • GB 0610409 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007138345A1] A process for making high metal content stabilised metal nanoparticles, comprises decomposing at least one metal acetylide in the presence of a first solvent under reducing conditions to yield a metal colloid solution and then recovering metal nanoparticles as a precipitate by either evaporating the first solvent or adding a second solvent to the first solvent. The metal colloid solution obtainable as an intermediate by such a process and the high metal content stabilised metal nanoparticles obtainable as the final product of such a process are also disclosed.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22B 11/00 (2006.01); B22F 9/16 (2006.01); B22F 9/24 (2006.01); C07F 1/00 (2006.01); C07F 1/12 (2006.01); C22B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22B 11/00 (2013.01); B01J 13/00 (2013.01); B22F 1/0018 (2013.01); B22F 9/24 (2013.01); B82Y 30/00 (2013.01); C22B 5/00 (2013.01); B22F 2998/00 (2013.01); B22F 2998/10 (2013.01); B22F 2999/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B22F 2998/10 + B22F 9/24 + B22F 9/30 + B22F 9/026
  2. B22F 2999/00 + B22F 9/24 + B22F 2202/11
  3. B22F 2998/00 + B22F 1/0022

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007138345A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007138345 A1 20071206; EP 2021520 A1 20090211; GB 0610409 D0 20060705

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111129

2011-11-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOHNSON MATTHEY PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY

2009-07-01 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT TR

2009-04-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090320

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081124

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS