Global Patent Index - EP 2021537 A1

EP 2021537 A1 2009-02-11 - SPANDEX FIBERS CONTAINING PARTIALLY DEHYDROXYLATED HYDROTALCITE

Title (en)

SPANDEX FIBERS CONTAINING PARTIALLY DEHYDROXYLATED HYDROTALCITE

Title (de)

ELASTHANFASERN MIT PARTIELL DEHYDROXYLIERTEM HYDROTALCIT

Title (fr)

FIBRES SPANDEX CONTENANT DE L'HYDROTALCITE PARTIELLEMENT DÉSHYDROXYLÉE

Publication

EP 2021537 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07708702 A

Priority

  • KR 2007000551 W
  • KR 20060041407 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007129807A1] This invention provides a spandex fiber comprising a partially dehydroxylated hydrotalcite in an amount of 0.1 to 10 % by weight, which has excellent discoloration-resistance and chlorine-resistance as well as the intrinsic properties of spandex fiber, and thus it can be advantageously used in the manufacture of underwears, socks, and sports apparel.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/70 (2006.01); D01F 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/70 (2013.01); D01F 1/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

IT TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007129807 A1 20071115; BR PI0711341 A2 20110830; BR PI0711341 B1 20170801; CN 101528993 A 20090909; CN 101528993 B 20110713; EP 2021537 A1 20090211; EP 2021537 A4 20091209; EP 2021537 B1 20101124; JP 2009536274 A 20091008; JP 4728425 B2 20110720; KR 100762548 B1 20071004; KR 20060066689 A 20060616; TW 200742777 A 20071116; TW I322838 B 20100401

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180212

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-05-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180108

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110825

2010-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): IT TR

2010-06-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100305

2009-12-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20091109

2009-12-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D01F 6/70 20060101AFI20080131BHEP

2009-12-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D01F 1/10 20060101ALI20091103BHEP

2009-07-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-06-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): IT TR

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081204

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS