Global Patent Index - EP 2021539 A1

EP 2021539 A1 2009-02-11 - APPARATUS FOR NEEDLING A NONWOVEN WEB

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR NEEDLING A NONWOVEN WEB

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERNADELN EINER VLIESBAHN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR AIGUILLETER UNE BANDE D'ÉTOFFE NON TISSÉE

Publication

EP 2021539 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07725103 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004183 W
  • DE 102006023762 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007134731A1] An apparatus is described for needling a nonwoven web by way of at least one needle bar. The needle bar which has a needle board on its underside having a multiplicity of needles is held by a bar carrier which is driven into an oscillating movement in an up and down motion by means of a vertical drive and an oscillating movement in a to and fro motion by means of a horizontal drive. As vertical drive, at least two driven eccentric shafts and a plurality of connecting rods which are assigned to the eccentric shafts and are coupled to the bar carrier by way of their free ends are provided. The horizontal drive has at least one horizontal strut which is connected to the bar carrier by way of one end and, by way of an opposite end, is coupled to a gear mechanism kinematics system which has an eccentric drive. In order to obtain as simple and compact a construction of the horizontal drive as possible, the gear mechanism kinematics system according to the invention is formed by a swinging arm which is held by way of one end on a machine frame by a frame rotary joint, has a double rotary joint at the opposite end and is coupled to the horizontal strut and the eccentric drive at the double rotary joint.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 18/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 18/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007134731A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007134731 A1 20071129; EP 2021539 A1 20090211; EP 2021539 B1 20120613; TW 200806839 A 20080201; US 2009119894 A1 20090514; US 7614127 B2 20091110

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180518

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180518

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-07-11 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007010050

- Effective date: 20130314

2013-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130314

2012-08-09 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007010050

- Effective date: 20120809

2012-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2012-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HI TECH TEXTILE HOLDING GMBH

2012-01-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STRASSER, ROBERT

2012-01-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PLUMP, ANDREAS

2012-01-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: REUTTER, TILMAN

2009-06-10 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-06-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2009-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090330

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081204

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS