Global Patent Index - EP 2021551 A1

EP 2021551 A1 2009-02-11 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO A CONCRETE MASONRY HOLLOW BLOCK

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO A CONCRETE MASONRY HOLLOW BLOCK

Title (de)

VERBESSERUNGEN VON HOHLBLOCKSTEINEN AUS BETON

Title (fr)

PERFECTIONNEMENTS SE RAPPORTANT À UN BLOC CREUX DE MAçONNERIE EN BÉTON

Publication

EP 2021551 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07718869 A

Priority

  • AU 2007000622 W
  • AU 2006902458 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007128082A1] A building block having a body with three sets of opposing outer sides defining thereby a generally rectangular outer shape, the body having at least one passageway having an upper open end at a top of the block and an open lower end at a bottom of the block. An inner part of the block is comprised of a first material, and a second different material surrounds the inner part providing thereby an at least substantially continuous outer surface of said second material. A one side of a one of the sets of opposing sides having at least one protrusion extending outwardly from a planar surface of the side, and at least one cavity in the further opposed side of the same set of opposed sides in a position and of a size to receive and effect an alignment of a further block having the same shape and size of this first defined block, by receiving a or the protrusions into the cavity or cavities.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/04 (2006.01); E04C 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 1/40 (2013.01); E04B 2/16 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0208 (2013.01); E04B 2002/021 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0213 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007128082A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007128082 A1 20071115; AU 2007247786 A1 20071115; AU 2007247786 B2 20100513; BR PI0711693 A2 20111206; CA 2651640 A1 20071115; CN 101443520 A 20090527; EP 2021551 A1 20090211; JP 2009536276 A 20091008; KR 20090021347 A 20090303; RU 2008148557 A 20100620; US 2009173027 A1 20090709; US 2011239570 A1 20111006; ZA 200810421 B 20100127

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1128139

2013-07-31 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121201

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-10-16 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1128139

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081205

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS