Global Patent Index - EP 2021568 A1

EP 2021568 A1 2009-02-11 - MOTOR VEHICLE WINDOW LIFTER

Title (en)

MOTOR VEHICLE WINDOW LIFTER

Title (de)

KRAFTFAHRZEUGFENSTERHEBER

Title (fr)

LÈVE-VITRE DE VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 2021568 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07724541 A

Priority

  • EP 2007003611 W
  • DE 102006022676 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131598A1] The subject matter of the invention is a motor vehicle window lifter with a drive mechanism, with a force transmission mechanism to transmit force from the drive mechanism to a window pane, with a control mechanism to control the drive mechanism and/or the force transmission mechanism, which is designed in such a way that a force alternately directed upward and downward will automatically be transmitted to the window pane when the window pane is jammed.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/695 (2013.01); E05F 15/41 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/45 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/554 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007131598A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006022676 A1 20071122; EP 2021568 A1 20090211; EP 2021568 B1 20110615; WO 2007131598 A1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180424

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180414

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2012-07-12 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007007446

- Effective date: 20120316

2012-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120316

2011-07-21 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007007446

- Effective date: 20110721

2011-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2011-06-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-08-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-08-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-06-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090508

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080830

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS