Global Patent Index - EP 2021570 A1

EP 2021570 A1 2009-02-11 - GLAZING WITH A STEPPED PANE ELEMENT ADHESIVELY BONDED INTO A FRAME

Title (en)

GLAZING WITH A STEPPED PANE ELEMENT ADHESIVELY BONDED INTO A FRAME

Title (de)

VERGLASUNG MIT EINEM IN EINEN RAHMEN EINGEKLEBTEN STUFENSCHEIBENELEMENT

Title (fr)

VITRAGE AVEC UN ÉLÉMENT DE CAME COLLÉ DANS UN CADRE

Publication

EP 2021570 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07718463 A

Priority

  • AT 2007000252 W
  • AT 9062006 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007134356A1] A window or door glazing has a stepped pane element (3) which is adhesively bonded all the way around to a frame (10), for example the frame (10) of a window sash. In this case, two regions of adhesive compound are provided, firstly in the region of the smaller pane (2) of the stepped pane element (3), and secondly on the inside of the protruding edge of the larger glass pane (1) of the stepped pane element (3).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/308 (2013.01); E06B 3/56 (2013.01); E06B 3/6617 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007134356A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007134356 A1 20071129; EP 2021570 A1 20090211; US 2008256896 A1 20081023

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-08 [R18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20090806

2011-09-14 [D18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN (DELETED)

2011-04-06 [18RA] RECEIPT OF REQUEST FOR RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS

- Effective date: 20100623

2011-04-06 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-04-06 [R18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20090806

2010-08-04 [18RA] RECEIPT OF REQUEST FOR RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS

- Effective date: 20100623

2010-08-04 [D18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN (DELETED)

2010-01-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090806

2009-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090326

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20071221

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS