Global Patent Index - EP 2021592 A2

EP 2021592 A2 2009-02-11 - DEVICE FOR VENTILATING A CRANKCASE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR VENTILATING A CRANKCASE

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG FÜR DIE ENTLÜFTUNG EINES KURBELGEHÄUSES

Title (fr)

ÉQUIPEMENT DE PURGE D'AIR D'UN CARTER DE VILEBREQUIN

Publication

EP 2021592 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07728890 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054437 W
  • DE 102006024816 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007137934A2] The invention relates to a device (1) for ventilating a crankcase of an internal combustion engine, comprising a ventilation line leading from the crankcase to the suction line of the internal combustion engine, an oil-mist separator (2) for separating the oil parts from the blow-by-gases containing the oil-mist from the crankcase is arranged in the path thereof. Also, said device (1) comprises a pump (3) which is arranged upstream of the oil-mist separator (2) and which is used to produce a negative pressure. The invention is characterised in that the oil-mist separator (2) and the pump (3) are embodied as connected modules thus providing a particularly compact structure.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 13/022 (2013.01); F01M 13/021 (2013.01); F01M 13/023 (2013.01); F01M 2013/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137934A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006024816 A1 20071206; CN 101495720 A 20090729; CN 101495720 B 20110202; DE 502007003230 D1 20100506; EP 2021592 A2 20090211; EP 2021592 B1 20100324; JP 2009539013 A 20091112; JP 4991850 B2 20120801; US 2010294218 A1 20101125; US 8607767 B2 20131217; WO 2007137934 A2 20071206; WO 2007137934 A3 20090226

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180529

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-05-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-05-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-03-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101228

2010-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007003230 P 20100506

2010-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-02-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-02-03 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-04-01 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20090226

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RUPPEL, STEFAN

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OEZKAYA, YAKUP

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BEETZ, KLAUS

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ENDERICH, ANDREAS

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KISSNER, GERD

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081010

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS