Global Patent Index - EP 2021614 A1

EP 2021614 A1 2009-02-11 - AIR FILTER HOUSING FOR A COMPACT AIR FILTER ELEMENT

Title (en)

AIR FILTER HOUSING FOR A COMPACT AIR FILTER ELEMENT

Title (de)

LUFTFILTERGEHÄUSE FÜR EIN KOMPAKTLUFTFILTERELEMENT

Title (fr)

BOÎTIER de filtre À air pour un ÉlÉment de filtre À air compact

Publication

EP 2021614 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07728216 A

Priority

  • EP 2007053754 W
  • DE 102006025230 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007137910A1] An air filter housing (10) for at least one compact air filter element (20) has at least one filter chamber (1) which has in each case at least one hose connection piece (2, 3) at the ends. The compact air filter element (20) can be inserted between the hose connection pieces (2, 3) while sealing the cross section of the filter chamber. Attached to the air filter housing (10) is at least one resonator chamber element (5, 6) which is connected to the filter chamber (1) by at least one air-conducting passage (7, 8, 9) or slot.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/14 (2013.01); F02M 35/1216 (2013.01); F02M 35/1266 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137910A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006025230 A1 20071206; EP 2021614 A1 20090211; EP 2021614 B1 20170531; US 2009320420 A1 20091231; US 8262788 B2 20120911; WO 2007137910 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-05-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MANN+HUMMEL GMBH

2018-04-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DONALDSON COMPANY, INC.

- Effective date: 20180228

2018-02-28 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-02-28 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Document: DE 502007015670

2018-01-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-01-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-01-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170531

2018-01-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170531

2017-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170531

2017-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170531

2017-11-30 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170930

2017-11-30 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170531

2017-11-30 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170831

2017-10-31 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170531

2017-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170531

2017-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170531

2017-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170901

2017-10-10 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2017-10-04 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20170531

2017-07-06 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007015670

2017-06-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-06-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 897711 T

- Effective date: 20170615

2017-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2017-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-05-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BLOSSEY, WERNER

2017-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RIEGER, MARIO

2017-01-04 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20161208

2017-01-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02M 35/12 20060101AFI20161129BHEP

2016-11-29 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 502007015670

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: F02M0035140000

- IPC: F02M0035120000

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-04-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090304

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081110

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS