Global Patent Index - EP 2021616 A1

EP 2021616 A1 2009-02-11 - SOLENOID VALVE WITH FLOODED ARMATURE CHAMBER

Title (en)

SOLENOID VALVE WITH FLOODED ARMATURE CHAMBER

Title (de)

MAGNETVENTIL MIT GEFLUTETEM ANKERRAUM

Title (fr)

ÉLECTROVANNE À ESPACE D'INDUIT NOYÉ

Publication

EP 2021616 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07726781 A

Priority

  • EP 2007052266 W
  • DE 102006021735 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007128607A1] The invention relates to a fuel injector (10), comprising a solenoid valve (12), with a magnetic yoke (16), a solenoid coil (18) and an armature (32, 34). The armature (32, 34) is loaded in the closing direction by means of a closing spring (26). A cavity (50) including a controlled amount runs between a front face (58) of the magnetic yoke(16) and a front face (54) of the armature (32, 34). A recess (56, 66) increasing the volume of the cavity (50) is embodied on one of the front faces (54, 58).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0015 (2013.01); F02M 63/0019 (2013.01); F02M 63/0021 (2013.01); F02M 63/0031 (2013.01); F02M 63/007 (2013.01); F02M 2200/308 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007128607A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006021735 A1 20071115; EP 2021616 A1 20090211; EP 2021616 B1 20110518; WO 2007128607 A1 20071115

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170312

2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170312

2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-12-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171130

2017-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170312

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170529

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2012-06-14 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007007251

- Effective date: 20120221

2012-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120221

2011-06-30 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007007251

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-05-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-06-03 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-06-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081210

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS