Global Patent Index - EP 2021630 A1

EP 2021630 A1 2009-02-11 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE REFRIGERANT MASS FLOW OF A COMPRESSOR

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE REFRIGERANT MASS FLOW OF A COMPRESSOR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM REGELN DES KÄLTEMITTEL-MASSENSTROMS EINES VERDICHTERS

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION DU FLUX MASSIQUE DE FLUIDE FRIGORIGÉNE D'UN COMPRESSEUR

Publication

EP 2021630 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07723707 A

Priority

  • EP 2007002762 W
  • DE 102006024533 A
  • DE 102006029874 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007134665A1] A method for controlling the refrigerant mass flow of a compressor, in particular of an axial piston compressor, in particular also for motor vehicle air conditioning systems, in particular also for CO<SUB>2</SUB> as refrigerant, which has a drive shaft and a pivoting plate which can be adjusted with regard to its inclination to the drive shaft and which is arranged in a motor chamber of the compressor essentially defined by a housing of said compressor and which by its angle of deflection relative to the drive shaft defines the piston stroke of the compressor, wherein approximately one balance of moments is obtained between a moment M<SUB>sw</SUB> produced by masses moved in rotation and a moment M<SUB>k,ges </SUB>produced by masses moved in translation for at least one angle of deflection a<SUB>gI</SUB> of the pivoting plate, and wherein the product of the compressor speed, of the suction gas density p, and of the piston stroke s for different compressor speeds n is automatically maintained more or less constant, at least locally, in particular for compressor speeds n between 600 and 9000 r.p.m., in particular for compressor speeds between 2500 and 7000 r.p.m., while a pressure p<SUB>c</SUB> occurring in the motor chamber is likewise maintained approximately constant, as well as a compressor which is suitable for performing the method.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007134665A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006029874 A1 20071129; DE 502007003864 D1 20100701; EP 2021630 A1 20090211; EP 2021630 B1 20100519; WO 2007134665 A1 20071129

INPADOC legal status


2018-03-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170330

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-03-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-03-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110328

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110328

2011-06-09 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007003864

- Effective date: 20110221

2011-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110222

2010-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007003864 P 20100701

2010-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-06-10 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-06-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081118

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS