Global Patent Index - EP 2021676 A2

EP 2021676 A2 2009-02-11 - FIRE-PROTECTING PIPE CONNECTOR, FIRE-PROTECTING PIPE CONNECTION, AND PIPE SYSTEM

Title (en)

FIRE-PROTECTING PIPE CONNECTOR, FIRE-PROTECTING PIPE CONNECTION, AND PIPE SYSTEM

Title (de)

BRANDSCHUTZROHRVERBINDER, BRANDSCHUTZROHRVERBINDUNG UND ROHRLEITUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

RACCORD DE TUYAU DE PROTECTION CONTRE L'INCENDIE, RACCORDEMENT DE TUYAU DE PROTECTION CONTRE L'INCENDIE, ET SYSTÈME DE TUYAUTERIE

Publication

EP 2021676 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07725165 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004245 W
  • DE 102006026190 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE102006026190A1] The joint (10) has retainer connecting pieces (30, 32) forming respective retainers (20, 22) for end pieces (12, 16) of respective pipes (14, 18). A rigid material is manufactured during fire heat effect, and an overlay (84) is arranged on a side that is turned away from a passage region of an intermediate part (60), where the overlay is made of a material for forming a rigid body. A support sleeve encloses the retainer connecting pieces and an intermediate part, and is made of a heat conducting fire-heat proof material. An independent claim is also included for a fire protection piping system for fire-heat proof pipes.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16L 55/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16L 55/1026 (2013.01); F16L 5/04 (2013.01); F16L 5/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137692A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006026190 A1 20071129; EP 2021676 A2 20090211; WO 2007137692 A2 20071206; WO 2007137692 A3 20080306

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140805

2010-02-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100125

2009-09-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DUEKER GMBH & CO. KGAA

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHILDE, GUENTER

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WERNER, RUEDIGER

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081030

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS