Global Patent Index - EP 2021703 A2

EP 2021703 A2 2009-02-11 - MULTI-STAGE COMPRESSOR UNIT FOR A REFRIGERATION SYSTEM

Title (en)

MULTI-STAGE COMPRESSOR UNIT FOR A REFRIGERATION SYSTEM

Title (de)

MEHRSTUFIGE VERDICHTEREINHEIT FÜR EIN KÄLTESYSTEM

Title (fr)

UNITÉ DE COMPRESSEUR À ÉTAGES MULTIPLES POUR SYSTÈME DE RÉFRIGÉRATION

Publication

EP 2021703 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06771733 A

Priority

US 2006021123 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007142619A2] A multi-stage compressor unit for a refrigeration system configured to circulate a refrigerant comprises a first compressor sub-unit having a first stage and a second stage, and a second compressor sub-unit in parallel with the first compressor sub-unit and having a first stage. The first and second stages of the first compressor sub-unit each have a suction port and a discharge port. The first compressor sub-unit is configured to receive and compress a first portion of the refrigerant from an evaporator. The first stage of the second compressor sub-unit is configured to compress a second portion of the refrigerant.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 1/10 (2006.01); F25B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 1/10 (2013.01); F25B 9/008 (2013.01); F25B 2309/061 (2013.01); F25B 2400/075 (2013.01); F25B 2400/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007142619 A2 20071213; WO 2007142619 A3 20080828; WO 2007142619 B1 20081009; CN 101460789 A 20090617; CN 101460789 B 20110126; EP 2021703 A2 20090211; EP 2021703 A4 20120215; HK 1133918 A1 20111111; JP 2009539058 A 20091112; JP 5028481 B2 20120919; US 2009175748 A1 20090709

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20141003

2014-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140523

2012-02-15 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20120117

2012-02-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25B 1/10 20060101AFI20120111BHEP

2012-02-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25B 9/00 20060101ALI20120111BHEP

2009-09-09 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081126

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU