Global Patent Index - EP 2021707 A2

EP 2021707 A2 2009-02-11 - REFRIGERATOR AND/OR FREEZER

Title (en)

REFRIGERATOR AND/OR FREEZER

Title (de)

KÜHL- UND/ODER GEFRIERGERÄT

Title (fr)

RÉFRIGÉRATEUR ET/OU CONGÉLATEUR

Publication

EP 2021707 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07725516 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004618 W
  • DE 202006008238 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007134863A2] The present invention relates to a refrigerator and/or freezer having a basic structure in which is arranged at least one inner container for accommodating items which are to be refrigerated and/or frozen, and having at least one bearing block for bearing one or more doors by means of which the basic structure can be closed, wherein a transverse connecting element extends in a region between two walls of the basic structure, and wherein the bearing block is fixed on the transverse connecting element or on a component which is connected directly or indirectly to the transverse connecting element.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/00 (2006.01); F25D 23/02 (2006.01); F25D 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/00 (2013.01); F25D 23/02 (2013.01); F25D 23/065 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/31 (2013.01); F25D 2323/024 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007134863A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007134863 A2 20071129; WO 2007134863 A3 20080605; CN 101473180 A 20090701; CN 101473180 B 20130529; DE 202007018794 U1 20090416; EP 2021707 A2 20090211; EP 2021707 B1 20170517; ES 2637393 T3 20171013; RU 2008146070 A 20100527; US 2009260390 A1 20091022; US 8752920 B2 20140617

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20180220

2018-02-20 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007015652

2017-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170816

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-13 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2637393 T3

- Effective date: 20171013

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170614

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170529

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-06-29 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007015652

2017-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT TR

2017-05-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-01-18 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20161220

2010-02-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100113

2009-08-26 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-06-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT TR

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080903

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS