Global Patent Index - EP 2021710 A2

EP 2021710 A2 2009-02-11 - REFRIGERATION DEVICE

Title (en)

REFRIGERATION DEVICE

Title (de)

KÄLTEGERÄT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REFROIDISSEMENT

Publication

EP 2021710 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07728668 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054214 W
  • DE 202006007341 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007128730A2] The invention relates to a refrigeration device comprising an inner chamber that is delimited by an inner shell, an outer shell (1, 2) and an intermediate chamber that is arranged between the inner shell and the outer shell and that is filled with an insulating foam. Said refrigeration device also comprises a device for mounting electrical components and/or switches and/or displays, and a housing (15) equipped with an opening for securing to a cut-out section (3) in the outer shell (1) and a front panel (4) for covering said cut-out section (3). According to the invention, one side of the housing (15) lies against the inner face of the outer shell (2) such that heat can be transferred from the housing (15) to the outer shell (2).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 29/005 (2013.01); F25D 23/065 (2013.01); F25D 23/064 (2013.01); F25D 2400/361 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007128730A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202006007341 U1 20060713; CN 101438114 A 20090520; CN 101438114 B 20131127; EP 2021710 A2 20090211; RU 2008145651 A 20100620; RU 2426045 C2 20110810; WO 2007128730 A2 20071115; WO 2007128730 A3 20080410

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-15 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20161010

2016-10-10 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2015-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2009-08-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090325

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081208

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS