Global Patent Index - EP 2021717 A1

EP 2021717 A1 2009-02-11 - HEAT EXCHANGER FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (en)

HEAT EXCHANGER FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (de)

WÄRMETAUSCHER FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

ÉCHANGEUR THERMIQUE POUR VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES

Publication

EP 2021717 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07711950 A

Priority

  • EP 2007002271 W
  • DE 102006019024 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007121812A1] The invention relates to a heat exchanger for motor vehicles, for example charge air cooler or cooling liquid cooler, composed of tubes (1) which are formed from in each case two plates (1a, 1b) and which have two opposite longitudinal sides (L1, L2) and two opposite narrow sides (S), wherein one of the longitudinal sides (L1) is the inflow side (A) for for example cooling air, and composed of heat exchange fins (2) or the like arranged between the tubes (1), through which heat exchange fins (2) the cooling air flows freely, and composed of collecting spaces (3) which are formed at the ends (4a, 4b) of the tubes (1) or of the plates (1a, 1b), characterized in that at least the one end (4a) of the tubes (1) opens out into the longitudinal side (L2) which is remote from the inflow side (A), and in that the other end (4b) of the tubes (1) opens out either likewise into the remote longitudinal side (L2) or into the longitudinal side (L1) which forms the inflow side (A), or into one of the narrow sides (S). The heat exchanger has comparatively large heat-exchanging surfaces.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/0316 (2013.01); F28D 1/0471 (2013.01); F28F 9/0221 (2013.01); F28F 13/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007121812A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006019024 A1 20071031; CN 101432589 A 20090513; EP 2021717 A1 20090211; EP 2021717 B1 20110817; US 2009260787 A1 20091022; WO 2007121812 A1 20071101; WO 2007121812 A8 20071213; WO 2007121812 A9 20081002

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160315

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160315

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-09-13 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007007971

- Effective date: 20120521

2012-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120521

2011-10-27 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007007971

- Effective date: 20111027

2011-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2011-08-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2011-08-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2011-06-15 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100311

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081125

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS