Global Patent Index - EP 2021724 A1

EP 2021724 A1 2009-02-11 - PROTECTIVE COATING FOR COMPONENTS OF A WEAPON OR THE LIKE

Title (en)

PROTECTIVE COATING FOR COMPONENTS OF A WEAPON OR THE LIKE

Title (de)

SCHUTZSCHICHT FÜR BAUTEILE EINER WAFFE ODER DERGLEICHEN

Title (fr)

COUCHE DE PROTECTION DESTINÉE À DES COMPOSANTS D'UNE ARME OU SIMILAIRES

Publication

EP 2021724 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07725353 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004445 W
  • DE 102006025244 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007137716A1] A chrome layer (2) is used as an anticorrosion coating. Said coating is preferably electrodeposited. A thin silver layer (3) is applied on top of the chrome layer (2) in areas (4) where the components (1) or the surfaces (2) thereof are subject to abrasive wear, said silver layer (3) having the effect of a lubricant. It was surprisingly found that there is no need for other lubricants on the weapon components (1), thereby increasing ease of maintenance.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 27/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 29/00 (2013.01); C23C 28/023 (2013.01); C23C 30/00 (2013.01); F41A 27/08 (2013.01); F41A 27/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137716A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006025244 A1 20071206; EP 2021724 A1 20090211; WO 2007137716 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-17 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20140616

2014-06-16 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-12-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20111103

2009-11-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL WAFFE MUNITION GMBH

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081015

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS