Global Patent Index - EP 2021725 A1

EP 2021725 A1 2009-02-11 - PROTECTIVE LAYER ESPECIALLY FOR COMPONENTS OF A WEAPON, A CARRIAGE, A TURRET OR THE LIKE, ESPECIALLY AS AN ANTI-CORROSION PROTECTION OF SAID COMPONENTS

Title (en)

PROTECTIVE LAYER ESPECIALLY FOR COMPONENTS OF A WEAPON, A CARRIAGE, A TURRET OR THE LIKE, ESPECIALLY AS AN ANTI-CORROSION PROTECTION OF SAID COMPONENTS

Title (de)

SCHUTZSCHICHT FÜR TEILE INSBESONDERE EINER WAFFE, EINER LAFETTE, EINES TURMES ODER DERGLEICHEN, INSBESONDERE ALS KORROSIONSSCHUTZ DIESER TEILE

Title (fr)

COUCHE DE PROTECTION DESTINÉE À DES PIÈCES, NOTAMMENT D'UNE ARME, D'UN AFFÛT DE CANON, D'UNE TOUR OU SIMILAIRES, NOTAMMENT EN TANT QUE PROTECTION CONTRE LA CORROSION DE CES PIÈCES

Publication

EP 2021725 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07725352 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004444 W
  • DE 102006025243 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007137715A1] The surfaces (2) of components (1) of a weapon etc. that are subject to external environmental influences are provided with a hydrophobic and oleophobic protective layer (3), said layer imparting an anti-corrosion protection and allowing an increased ease of maintenance since the weapon can be cleaned more effectively and easily. The protective layer used can be polysiloxane that is applied by nano-coating technology.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 29/00 (2006.01); F41A 35/02 (2006.01); F41H 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 29/00 (2013.01); C23C 30/00 (2013.01); F41A 35/02 (2013.01); F41H 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137715A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006025243 A1 20071206; EP 2021725 A1 20090211; WO 2007137715 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20120818

2012-08-18 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090608

2009-05-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081105

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS