Global Patent Index - EP 2021808 A2

EP 2021808 A2 2009-02-11 - BIOLOGICAL ANALYSIS PACKAGING DEVICE

Title (en)

BIOLOGICAL ANALYSIS PACKAGING DEVICE

Title (de)

BIOLOGISCHE ANALYSEVERPACKUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONDITIONNEMENT POUR ANALYSE BIOLOGIQUE

Publication

EP 2021808 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 07731459 A

Priority

  • FR 2007000821 W
  • FR 0604336 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007132095A2] The invention relates to an automated biological analysis packaging device, characterised in that it comprises the samples under analysis, the reagent(s), and the information required to perform one or more analyses of a biological fluid sample and a location intended to receive, and if applicable process, the waste from the analysis.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 35/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 35/025 (2013.01); G01N 35/1002 (2013.01); G01N 2035/00752 (2013.01); G01N 2035/0436 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007132095A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007132095 A2 20071122; WO 2007132095 A3 20080103; BR PI0712407 A2 20120904; CN 101490561 A 20090722; EP 2021808 A2 20090211; FR 2901360 A1 20071123; JP 2009537808 A 20091029; JP 2013140176 A 20130718; JP 5286253 B2 20130911; US 2010062521 A1 20100311

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150929

2011-05-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110420

2009-08-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-02-25 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-02-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081216

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS