Global Patent Index - EP 2021828 A1

EP 2021828 A1 2009-02-11 - X-RAY CONTROL SYSTEMS WITH LARGE-AREA DETECTOR

Title (en)

X-RAY CONTROL SYSTEMS WITH LARGE-AREA DETECTOR

Title (de)

RÖNTGENKONTROLLSYSTEME MIT GROSSFLÄCHIGEREM DETEKTOR

Title (fr)

SYSTEMES DE CONTROLE DE RAYONS X A DETECTEUR VASTE

Publication

EP 2021828 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07728162 A

Priority

  • EP 2007053697 W
  • DE 102006024711 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE102006024711A1] X-ray control system comprises an X-ray radiation source and an X-ray radiation detector with a read-out device and a screen. The detector is an organic photo-detector. Preferred Features: The organic photo-detector comprises individual pixilated photodiodes. Many detectors are combined producing a large detector surface.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01T 1/20 (2006.01); G01V 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01T 1/2018 (2013.01); G01V 5/0008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137907A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006024711 A1 20071129; EP 2021828 A1 20090211; WO 2007137907 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100916

2010-04-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090916

2009-02-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FUERST, JENS

2009-02-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HENSELER, DEBORA

2009-02-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RUDOLPH, OLIVER

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081124

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS