Global Patent Index - EP 2021835 A2

EP 2021835 A2 2009-02-11 - METHOD OF ANALYZING A SUBTERRANEAN FORMATION USING TIME DEPENDENT TRANSIENT RESPONSE SIGNALS

Title (en)

METHOD OF ANALYZING A SUBTERRANEAN FORMATION USING TIME DEPENDENT TRANSIENT RESPONSE SIGNALS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE EINER UNTERIRDISCHEN FORMATION MITHILFE ZEITABHÄNGIGER TRANSIENTER ANTWORTSIGNALE

Title (fr)

METHODE D'ANALYSE DE FORMATION SOUTERRAINE UTILISANT DES SIGNAUX DE REPONSE TRANSITOIRES DEPENDANTS DU TEMPS

Publication

EP 2021835 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07783066 A

Priority

  • US 2007067977 W
  • US 79755606 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131007A2] Method of analyzing a subterranean formation traversed by a wellbore. The method uses a tool comprising a transmitter antenna and a receiver antenna, the subterranean formation comprising one or more formation layers. The tool is suspended inside the wellbore, and one or more electromagnetic fields are induced in the formation. One or more time-dependent transient response signals are detected and analyzed. Electromagnetic anisotropy of at least one of the formation layers is detectable. Geosteering cues may be derived from the time-dependent transient response signals, for continued drilling of the well bore until a hydrocarbon reservoir is reached. The hydrocarbon may then be produced.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01V 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01V 3/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007131007A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB NL

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007131007 A2 20071115; WO 2007131007 A3 20080403; AU 2007248114 A1 20071115; AU 2007248114 B2 20101216; BR PI0711054 A2 20110823; CA 2651275 A1 20071115; EA 200870499 A1 20090428; EP 2021835 A2 20090211; NO 20084967 A 20081126; US 2007256832 A1 20071108

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150714

2015-04-01 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150302

2013-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130108

2009-08-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-06-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): FR GB NL

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081014

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS