Global Patent Index - EP 2021907 A2

EP 2021907 A2 2009-02-11 - WIRELESS ARCHITECTURE FOR A TRADITIONAL WIRE-BASED PROTOCOL

Title (en)

WIRELESS ARCHITECTURE FOR A TRADITIONAL WIRE-BASED PROTOCOL

Title (de)

DRAHTLOSE ARCHITEKTUR FÜR EIN TRADITIONELLES DRAHTBASIERTES PROTOKOLL

Title (fr)

ARCHITECTURE SANS FIL DESTINÉE À UN PROTOCOLE CÂBLÉ TRADIOTIONNEL

Publication

EP 2021907 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07797805 A

Priority

  • US 2007069813 W
  • US 80906806 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007140342A2] Embodiments are described in connection with transferring data traditionally communicated through a wired link over a high-speed wireless link. The disclosed embodiments provide the wired and/or wireless data communication with minimal changes on the existing wired architecture. According to an embodiment is an apparatus for communicating wirelessly over a traditional wired link. The apparatus includes a transmitter comprising a host and a first portion of a client connected by a wired link and a receiver comprising a second portion of the client. According to some embodiments, the apparatus can include a query module that determines an operation rate based in part on a rate supported by a medium access control and a retransmission statistic and an assigner module that assigns a communication to a wired protocol or a wireless protocol.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04W 28/22 (2009.01); G06F 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 28/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007140342A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007140342 A2 20071206; WO 2007140342 A3 20080306; CN 101427211 A 20090506; CN 101427211 B 20120620; CN 101432683 A 20090513; CN 101432683 B 20130828; CN 101965023 A 20110202; CN 103442396 A 20131211; CN 103442396 B 20170412; CN 105682152 A 20160615; EP 2021907 A2 20090211; EP 2021908 A2 20090211; EP 2021908 B1 20141029; HK 1220856 A1 20170512; JP 2009539330 A 20091112; JP 2009539331 A 20091112; JP 2013062820 A 20130404; JP 2015111842 A 20150618; JP 4944194 B2 20120530; JP 5675748 B2 20150225; JP 6022532 B2 20161109; KR 101033782 B1 20110513; KR 101068425 B1 20110928; KR 101181690 B1 20120919; KR 20080110936 A 20081219; KR 20080113131 A 20081226; KR 20100046069 A 20100504; WO 2007140344 A2 20071206; WO 2007140344 A3 20080327

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170301

2016-11-16 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20161018

2016-11-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KRISHNAN, RANGANATHAN

2016-11-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DHARMARAJU, DINESH

2016-11-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEUNG, LAUREN

2016-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 13/14 20060101ALI20160929BHEP

2016-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04W 28/22 20090101AFI20160929BHEP

2009-09-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090416

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DHARMARAJU, DINESH C/O QUALCOMM INCORPORATED

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KRISHNAN, RANGANATHAN

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEUNG, LAUREN

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081124

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS