Global Patent Index - EP 2021910 A2

EP 2021910 A2 2009-02-11 - NEXT GENERATION CLUSTERING

Title (en)

NEXT GENERATION CLUSTERING

Title (de)

CLUSTERUNG DER NÄCHSTEN GENERATION

Title (fr)

GESTION DE GRAPPE DE NOUVELLE GÉNÉRATION

Publication

EP 2021910 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07709948 A

Priority

  • US 2007060102 W
  • US 74736406 P
  • US 42578406 A
  • US 54823906 A
  • US 55055106 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007136883A2] One embodiment of the present invention comprises determining a cluster leader and using the cluster leader to set up a lease table at an application server of a cluster of application servers. The lease table can be used to maintain at least one lease for a singleton service.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 7/00 (2006.01); G06F 11/14 (2006.01); G06F 11/20 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 67/325 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007136883 A2 20071129; WO 2007136883 A3 20080424; AU 2007254088 A1 20071129; CA 2652147 A1 20071129; CN 101460921 A 20090617; CN 101460921 B 20130522; CN 103327066 A 20130925; CN 103327066 B 20160817; EP 2021910 A2 20090211; EP 2021910 A4 20150506

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151110

2015-05-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20150409

2015-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 11/20 20060101ALI20150401BHEP

2015-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 11/14 20060101ALI20150401BHEP

2015-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 29/08 20060101ALI20150401BHEP

2015-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 7/00 20060101AFI20150401BHEP

2014-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 11/14 20060101ALI20141111BHEP

2014-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 29/08 20060101ALI20141111BHEP

2014-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 11/20 20060101ALI20141111BHEP

2014-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 7/00 20060101AFI20141111BHEP

2012-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ORACLE INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

2009-08-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-07-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2009-03-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REVANURU, NARESH

2009-03-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FUNG, PRISCILLA, C.

2009-03-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RANGANATHAN, VENKATESAN

2009-03-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FISKE, AARON

2009-03-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JACOBS, DEAN, BERNARD

2009-03-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PEDDADA, PRASAD

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081208

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS