Global Patent Index - EP 2021917 A1

EP 2021917 A1 2009-02-11 - METHOD FOR MANAGING THE VERSION OF AUTOMATION DATA IN A POWER PLANT AUTOMATION SYSTEM

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MANAGING THE VERSION OF AUTOMATION DATA IN A POWER PLANT AUTOMATION SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERSIONSVERWALTUNG VON AUTOMATISIERUNGSDATEN EINES KRAFTWERK-AUTOMATISIERUNGSSYSTEMS

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE VERSION DE DONNÉES D'AUTOMATISATION D'UN SYSTÈME D'AUTOMATISATION DE CENTRALE ÉLECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 2021917 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07712048 A

Priority

  • EP 2007050501 W
  • EP 06010969 A
  • EP 07712048 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1860548A1] The method involves exporting versions of a data item of the automation data into an inter-operable format using a specific tool. The versions, in the form of an inter-operable format, are managed using a version management system (9). The automation data is stored in different data stores on platforms (2-5) of the power plant automation system (1), where platforms are networked to one another.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 8/71 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137879A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1860548 A1 20071128; EP 2021917 A1 20090211; US 2009222495 A1 20090903; WO 2007137879 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160330

2013-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2012-01-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20111221

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081127

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS