Global Patent Index - EP 2021924 A1

EP 2021924 A1 2009-02-11 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EXCHANGING DATA ON THE BASIS OF THE OPC COMMUNICATIONS PROTOCOL BETWEEN REDUNDANT PROCESS AUTOMATION COMPONENTS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EXCHANGING DATA ON THE BASIS OF THE OPC COMMUNICATIONS PROTOCOL BETWEEN REDUNDANT PROCESS AUTOMATION COMPONENTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSTAUSCH VON DATEN AUF BASIS DES OPC-KOMMUNIKATIONSPROTOKOLLS ZWISCHEN REDUNDANTEN PROZESSAUTOMATISIERUNGSKOMPONENTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'ECHANGE DE DONNEES SUR LA BASE DU PROTOCOLE DE COMMUNICATION OPC ENTRE DES COMPOSANTS D'AUTOMATISATION DE PROCESSUS REDONDANTS

Publication

EP 2021924 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07704284 A

Priority

  • EP 2007050962 W
  • EP 06010923 A
  • EP 07704284 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1860564A1] The method involves connecting an Open connectivity client (28) with the master OPC server (22) by a communication connection (26), and with that a ready OPC server (24) is connected by another communication connection. The open connectivity (OPC) client exchanges data with automation devices. The data coming from the master OPC server and the ready OPC server, is evaluated. The data is switched to the ready OPC server partly by the master OPC server in case of an error by the OPC client, in such a way that the program execution is smoothly continued at the same place. An independent claim is also included for the device for the exchange of data on basis of the OPC communication protocol.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 11/20 (2006.01); G05B 19/41 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 69/26 (2013.01); H04L 69/40 (2013.01); G05B 2219/34263 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137880A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1860564 A1 20071128; EP 2021924 A1 20090211; US 2010005336 A1 20100107; US 8132042 B2 20120306; WO 2007137880 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-12 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20130208

2013-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2013-02-08 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2012-08-01 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090917

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JORDAN, CARSTEN

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KLEYER, DIETER

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHMIDT, LOTHAR

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ZIMMER, AXEL

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081127

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS