Global Patent Index - EP 2021930 A1

EP 2021930 A1 2009-02-11 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING DEVICE IDENTIFIERS FOR SERIALLY INTERCONNECTED DEVICES

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING DEVICE IDENTIFIERS FOR SERIALLY INTERCONNECTED DEVICES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM FESTLEGEN VON EINRICHTUNGSKENNUNGEN FÜR SERIELLE MITEINANDER VERBUNDENE EINRICHTUNGEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ÉTABLIR DES IDENTIFIANTS DE DISPOSITIF AFIN D'INTERCONNECTER DES DISPOSITIFS EN SÉRIE

Publication

EP 2021930 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07719813 A

Priority

  • CA 2007000891 W
  • US 80264506 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007134444A1] A method or apparatus operates a multitude of devices in a serial interconnection configuration to establish a device identifier (ID) for each device. An input signal is transmitted through a serial interconnection to a first device using inputs that are also used by the first device to input other information thereto (e.g., data, commands, control signals). A generating circuit generates a device ID in response to the input signal. A transfer circuit then transfers an output signal associated with the device ID to a second device through a serial output of the first device. The serial output is also used by the first device to output other information (e.g., signals, data) to another device in the serial interconnection configuration.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06F 13/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/4256 (2013.01); G06F 2213/0052 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007134444 A1 20071129; CA 2651434 A1 20071129; CN 101449251 A 20090603; CN 101449251 B 20110511; EP 2021930 A1 20090211; EP 2021930 A4 20110420; JP 2009538065 A 20091029; JP 2012208948 A 20121025; JP 2015043244 A 20150305; JP 5118130 B2 20130116; KR 101354376 B1 20140122; KR 101443002 B1 20140923; KR 20090031516 A 20090326; KR 20130081320 A 20130716; KR 20140029537 A 20140310; TW 200819981 A 20080501; TW 201430568 A 20140801; TW I439860 B 20140601

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151201

2014-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONVERSANT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

2012-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120913

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-04-20 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20110323

2010-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MOSAID TECHNOLOGIES INCORPORATED

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081201

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS