Global Patent Index - EP 2021965 A2

EP 2021965 A2 2009-02-11 - APPLICATION OF ABNORMAL EVENT DETECTION TECHNOLOGY TO DELAYED COKING UNIT

Title (en)

APPLICATION OF ABNORMAL EVENT DETECTION TECHNOLOGY TO DELAYED COKING UNIT

Title (de)

ANWENDUNG EINER TECHNOLOGIE ZUR ERKENNUNG ANOMALER EREIGNISSE AUF EINEN DELAYED-KOKER

Title (fr)

APPLICATION D'UN PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'ÉVÉNEMENT ANORMAL À UNE UNITÉ DE COKÉFACTION DIFFÉRÉE

Publication

EP 2021965 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07775776 A

Priority

  • US 2007009576 W
  • US 79429606 P
  • US 78695007 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2007250292A1] The present invention is a method for detecting an abnormal event for process units of a Delayed Coking Unit. The method compares the operation of the process units to statistical and engineering models. The statistical models are developed by principal components analysis of the normal operation for these units. The engineering models are based statistical and correlation analysis between variables. If the difference between the operation of a process unit and the normal model result indicates an abnormal condition, then the cause of the abnormal condition is determined and corrected.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05B 23/02 (2006.01); C10B 55/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10B 55/00 (2013.01); G05B 23/0254 (2013.01); G05B 23/0289 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

US 2007250292 A1 20071025; US 7720641 B2 20100518; CA 2649863 A1 20071101; CA 2649863 C 20130924; EP 2021965 A2 20090211; EP 2021965 A4 20140430; JP 2009534746 A 20090924; NO 20084879 A 20090121; WO 2007124002 A2 20071101; WO 2007124002 A3 20090402

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20161101

2014-04-30 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-04-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10B 55/00 20060101ALI20140325BHEP

2014-04-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G05B 23/02 20060101AFI20140325BHEP

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 11/00 20060101AFI20090602BHEP

2009-05-06 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20090402

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081120

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS