EP 2021975 A1 20090211 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE DETERMINATION OF THE CLEARANCE IN FRONT OF A VEHICLE
Title (en)
DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE DETERMINATION OF THE CLEARANCE IN FRONT OF A VEHICLE
Title (de)
VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN EINES FREIRAUMS VOR EINEM FAHRZEUG
Title (fr)
DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTERMINER UN ESPACE LIBRE DEVANT UN VÉHICULE
Publication
Application
Priority
- DE 2007000788 W 20070503
- DE 102006022739 A 20060512
- DE 102006060893 A 20061222
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO2007131470A1] The invention relates to a device (14) for the determination of the clearance in front of a vehicle (10), comprising: - a sensor (16) with an imaging means which is designed to take a picture of the observation region (22) in front of the vehicle (10); - an image processing unit (18) which is designed to process the picture that has been taken in order to obtain a processing image in which the edges of the picture are marked in the picture; - and a pattern recognition unit (20) which is designed to define, as the clearance in front of the vehicle (10), that portion of the observation region (22) which, starting on an area free of edges in the processing image, corresponds to a lower picture edge of the picture.
IPC 8 full level
G06K 9/00 (2006.01); B60Q 1/52 (2006.01); G06T 7/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G06T 7/13 (2016.12); G06T 7/215 (2016.12); G06T 7/254 (2016.12); G06V 20/58 (2022.01); G06T 2207/10016 (2013.01); G06T 2207/20068 (2013.01); G06T 2207/30261 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
See references of WO 2007131470A1
Citation (examination)
- WO 9953430 A1 19991021 - EYEMATIC INTERFACES INC [US], et al
- US 2002005898 A1 20020117 - KAWADA RYOICHI [JP], et al
- ULRICH I ET AL: "Appearance-based obstacle detection with monocular color vision", PROCEEDINGS / SEVENTEENTH NATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE (AAAI-2000), TWELFTH INNOVATIVE APPLICATIONS OF ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE CONFERENCE (IAAI-2000)JULY 30 - AUGUST 3, 2000, AAAI PRESS, MENLO PARK, CALIF, 30 July 2000 (2000-07-30), pages 866 - 871, XP002597792, ISBN: 978-0-262-51112-4
- ANONYMOUS: "Sussex Computer Vision: TEACH VISION6", 31 December 1994 (1994-12-31), XP055461926, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://homepages.inf.ed.ac.uk/rbf/CVonline/LOCAL_COPIES/YOUNG/vision6.html> [retrieved on 20180322]
- BERTOZZI M ET AL: "Real-time lane and obstacle detection on the GOLD system", INTELLIGENT VEHICLES SYMPOSIUM, 1996., PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1996 IEEE TOKYO, JAPAN 19-20 SEPT. 1, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, 19 September 1996 (1996-09-19), pages 213 - 218, XP010209737, ISBN: 978-0-7803-3652-0, DOI: 10.1109/IVS.1996.566380
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR
Designated extension state (EPC)
AL BA HR MK RS
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DE 102006060893 A1 20071115; DE 112007000332 A5 20081113; EP 2021975 A1 20090211; WO 2007131470 A1 20071122
DOCDB simple family (application)
DE 102006060893 A 20061222; DE 112007000332 T 20070503; DE 2007000788 W 20070503; EP 07722345 A 20070503