Global Patent Index - EP 2021982 A1

EP 2021982 A1 2009-02-11 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SUCCESSIVELY TRANSPORTING A PLURALITY OF GSM CHIP CARDS

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SUCCESSIVELY TRANSPORTING A PLURALITY OF GSM CHIP CARDS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFEINANDERFOLGENDEN TRANSPORT EINER MEHRZAHL VON GSM-CHIPKARTEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR LE TRANSPORT SUCCESSIF D'UNE PLURALITE DE CARTES A PUCES GSM

Publication

EP 2021982 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07728482 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054026 W
  • DE 102006019785 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007125063A1] The invention relates to an apparatus and a method for successively transporting a plurality of cards, particularly GSM chip cards, arranged in a series between at least one supply track (12) and a first tray element (22, 24), which can be moved perpendicular to the orientation of the supply track (12), using at least one transfer station (30, 31) within a card handling apparatus (11), where the transfer station (30, 31) has at least two transport elements (49, 50), which can each be rotated about an axis (47, 48) running perpendicular to the plane of the supply track (12) and the first tray element (22, 24), for receiving and depositing individual cards (13), the transport elements (49, 50) being able to move to and fro along the orientation of the first tray element (22, 24) and of a second tray element (21, 23) which can be moved in the direction of the first tray element (22, 24).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 13/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 13/07 (2013.01); G06K 2017/0041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007125063A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007125063 A1 20071108; CN 101443793 A 20090527; CN 101443793 B 20111228; DE 102006019785 A1 20071115; DE 102006019785 B4 20090108; EP 2021982 A1 20090211; TW 200800769 A 20080101; TW I332929 B 20101111; US 2010028107 A1 20100204

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121011

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2012-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120531

2009-05-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081126

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS