Global Patent Index - EP 2021990 A2

EP 2021990 A2 2009-02-11 - METHOD TO FACILITATE ENGAGEMENT AND COMMUNICATION BETWEEN A COMPANY AND A RECRUITER

Title (en)

METHOD TO FACILITATE ENGAGEMENT AND COMMUNICATION BETWEEN A COMPANY AND A RECRUITER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG VON ENGAGEMENT UND KOMMUNIKATION ZWISCHEN EINER FIRMA UND EINEM ANWERBER

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ POUR FACILITER L'ENGAGEMENT ET LA COMMUNICATION ENTRE UNE SOCIÉTÉ ET UN RECRUTEUR

Publication

EP 2021990 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06827771 A

Priority

  • US 2006044041 W
  • US 74737306 P
  • US 80660306 P
  • US 80660606 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007136407A2] The present invention includes a method to facilitate engagement and communication between a company with an available position and a recruiter. The method includes the steps of posting information about the available position for the company, and receiving information about a candidate for the available position of the company from the recruiter, and submitting the information about the candidate for the available position of the company to the company. The method further includes the step of receiving payment from the company and transmitting a portion of the payment to the recruiter upon the selection by the company of a candidate for the available position.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 99/00 (2006.01); G06Q 10/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007136407A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007136407 A2 20071129; WO 2007136407 A3 20090430; EP 2021990 A2 20090211; WO 2007136408 A2 20071129; WO 2007136408 A3 20090514

INPADOC legal status


2012-12-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120601

2010-04-07 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-06-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06Q 99/00 20060101AFI20090514BHEP

2009-06-03 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-04-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOUNTY JOBS, INC

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JEREMY LAPPIN

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS