Global Patent Index - EP 2021997 A1

EP 2021997 A1 2009-02-11 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CREATING PROFIT USING PERSONAL WEBSITE

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CREATING PROFIT USING PERSONAL WEBSITE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON PROFIT UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER PERSÖNLICHEN WEBSITE

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME GÉNÉRANT DU PROFIT EN UTILISANT UN SITE WEB PERSONNEL

Publication

EP 2021997 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07746774 A

Priority

  • KR 2007002627 W
  • KR 20060049608 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007139351A1] The present invention relates, in general, to a method and system for generating profit using a personal website and, more particularly, to a method and system for generating profit using a personal website, which automatically post an advertisement or a news item suitable for the characteristics of each personal website provided in a member client or each personal website provided in an information provision server, on the personal website, and enable a member, operating the personal website, to generate profit. Therefore, the present invention provides advertisements suitable for the characteristics of personal websites, thus providing a new source of profit to member clients operating the personal websites.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007139351 A1 20071206; CN 101460967 A 20090617; EP 2021997 A1 20090211; EP 2021997 A4 20101208; JP 2010506243 A 20100225; KR 100626159 B1 20060913

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121120

2012-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20121009

2010-12-08 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20101108

2009-07-22 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081126

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS