Global Patent Index - EP 2022016 A1

EP 2022016 A1 2009-02-11 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR LOADING VALUE TO A SMARTCARD

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR LOADING VALUE TO A SMARTCARD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM LADEN EINES WERTS IN EINE CHIPKARTE

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR PAYER UN MONTANT AVEC UNE CARTE À PUCE INTELLIGENTE

Publication

EP 2022016 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07730593 A

Priority

  • FI 2007000124 W
  • FI 20060476 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007132056A1] The invention relates to a method and a system for loading value to a smartcard that is arranged to function in a telecommunications system. The telecommunications system comprises an order system provided or maintained, for example, by a first service provider, such as a telecommunications operator. The order system is linked to a mobile communications system in such a way that it is possible to transfer messages from the order system to the mobile communications system and especially to a mobile terminal equipment connected thereto. The mobile terminal equipment comprises a smartcard and an NFC interface communicating with the smartcard. Further, the system comprises a card reader provided with an NFC interface. In the method, a voucher is created in the order system and transferred to the mobile terminal equipment. According to the invention, the voucher is transferred to the card reader via the NFC interface. The voucher is verified with the card reader and transformed into a smartcard value file. The value file is saved on the smartcard.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/10 (2006.01); G06F 17/00 (2006.01); G06Q 20/00 (2012.01); G06Q 20/32 (2012.01); G06Q 20/34 (2012.01); G06Q 20/36 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/02 (2013.01); G06Q 20/32 (2013.01); G06Q 20/3278 (2013.01); G06Q 20/3437 (2013.01); G06Q 20/352 (2013.01); G06Q 20/363 (2013.01); G07F 7/0866 (2013.01); G07F 7/0893 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007132056 A1 20071122; EP 2022016 A1 20090211; EP 2022016 A4 20131127; FI 121196 B 20100813; FI 20060476 A0 20060515; FI 20060476 A 20071116; NO 20084389 A 20090202

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20151105

2015-11-05 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2014-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140702

2013-11-27 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20131025

2013-11-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 17/00 20060101ALI20131021BHEP

2013-11-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06Q 20/34 20120101ALI20131021BHEP

2013-11-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07F 7/10 20060101AFI20131021BHEP

2013-11-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06Q 20/32 20120101ALI20131021BHEP

2013-11-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06Q 20/36 20120101ALI20131021BHEP

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MARKKULA, PEKKA

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JURVANEN, TUUKKA

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STROEMBERG, DAN-ANDERS

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081119

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS