Global Patent Index - EP 2022037 A2

EP 2022037 A2 2009-02-11 - METHODS FOR SEQUENTIAL COLOR DISPLAY BY MODULATION OF PULSES

Title (en)

METHODS FOR SEQUENTIAL COLOR DISPLAY BY MODULATION OF PULSES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR SEQUENTIELLEN FARBANZEIGE DURCH MODULATION VON IMPULSEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'AFFICHAGE SEQUENTIEL COULEUR PAR MODULATION DE DUREE

Publication

EP 2022037 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 07729494 A

Priority

  • EP 2007055065 W
  • FR 0604798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007137994A2] Each color image is broken down into at least one series of at least three successive primary images of different primary colors which are displayed successively by modulating the activation pulse of the pixels of an imaging device; the invention requires that the spread of the pulse phase of the pixels be shortened over the three successive sub-frames: the pulse periods of the pixels of the first primary image are displaced to the end of the sub-frame of the first image, and the pulse period of the pixels of the third primary image are displaced in the sub-frame of the third primary image towards the beginning of the sub-frame of this third image. This has the beneficial effect of reducing color break defects.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/2014 (2013.01); G09G 3/3659 (2013.01); G09G 3/3406 (2013.01); G09G 3/3614 (2013.01); G09G 2300/0809 (2013.01); G09G 2300/0814 (2013.01); G09G 2300/0842 (2013.01); G09G 2310/0235 (2013.01); G09G 2310/0259 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137994A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

FR 2901905 A1 20071207; DE 602007012083 D1 20110303; EP 2022037 A2 20090211; EP 2022037 B1 20110119; US 2010026613 A1 20100204; US 8184133 B2 20120522; WO 2007137994 A2 20071206; WO 2007137994 A3 20080619

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180518

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602007012083

- Representative's name: HOFSTETTER, SCHURACK & PARTNER PATENT- UND REC, DE

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-05-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2012-02-16 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007012083

- Effective date: 20111020

2011-12-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111020

2011-03-03 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007012083

- Effective date: 20110303

2011-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602007012083 P 20110303

2011-02-02 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 602007012083

2011-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2011-01-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-02-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING

2009-11-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091015

2009-09-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MORVAN, PATRICK

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KERVEC, JONATHAN

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: THOLLOT, JULIEN

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS