Global Patent Index - EP 2022050 A1

EP 2022050 A1 2009-02-11 - MEMORY DATA WRITABLE AND READABLE BY MICROPOINTS, BOX STRUCTURES AND THE MANUFACTURING METHOD

Title (en)

MEMORY DATA WRITABLE AND READABLE BY MICROPOINTS, BOX STRUCTURES AND THE MANUFACTURING METHOD

Title (de)

DURCH MIKROPOINTS SCHREIBBARE UND LESBARE SPEICHERDATEN, BOX-STRUKTUREN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

MEMOIRE DE DONNEES INSCRIPTIBLE ET LISIBLE PAR MICROPOINTES, STRUCTUREE EN CAISSONS, ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 2022050 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07729586 A

Priority

  • EP 2007055163 W
  • FR 0604809 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007138035A1] This invention concerns data storage memory, writable and readable using at least one writing (60) or reading micropoint which touches on a contact point with a dedicated writing or reading point on the surface of a substrate, either to modify the physical state of the zone, in reading or erasure mode, or to determine the physical state of the zone since the data stored in the zone is defined by the physical state of the zone. The surface of the substrate is subdivided into aggregated individual *batches (75) composed of one layer of a first sensitive material whose state can be modified by the application of a writing micropoint, each *batch (75) being surrounded by a box (80) made of a second material with little or no sensitivity to the application of the writing micropoint, with this second material completely separating the individual *batches from each other. The material of the boxes is the same as that of the *batches although they are differentiated by differentiating impurities. The organization into *batches and into boxes may be achieved using photolithography or through a process of self-organization of materials that can be spontaneously agglomerated into *batches.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 9/14 (2006.01); G11B 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 9/149 (2013.01); B82Y 10/00 (2013.01); G11B 9/04 (2013.01); G11B 9/1472 (2013.01); G11C 13/0004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007138035A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

FR 2901909 A1 20071207; FR 2901909 B1 20081024; EP 2022050 A1 20090211; JP 2009539198 A 20091112; US 2009173929 A1 20090709; WO 2007138035 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111201

2010-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE ET AUX ENERGIES

2009-07-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2009-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090326

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081120

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS