Global Patent Index - EP 2022086 A1

EP 2022086 A1 2009-02-11 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING PHOTOVOLTAIC CELLS AND MODULES FROM SILICON WAFERS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING PHOTOVOLTAIC CELLS AND MODULES FROM SILICON WAFERS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FOTOVOLTAISCHEN ZELLEN UND MODULEN AUS SILIZIUMPLÄTTCHEN

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CELLULES ET MODULES PHOTOVOLTAÏQUES À PARTIR DE PLAQUETTES DE SILICIUM

Publication

EP 2022086 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07748136 A

Priority

  • SE 2007000472 W
  • SE 0601150 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007136318A1] Method for the production of photovoltaic modules from mono- or multi-crystalline silicon wafers and from wafers produced by ribbon silicon methods, whereby prior to said production each silicon wafer is affixed to a carrier by the use of vacuum, an adhesive or a frame. The wafers remain affixed to their respective carriers during the necessary processing steps, where-after the wafers are loosened from their carriers and placed onto glass sheets upon fÊnalization of the last production step.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/673 (2006.01); H01L 21/677 (2006.01); H01L 21/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/67346 (2013.01); H01L 21/67132 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007136318 A1 20071129; EP 2022086 A1 20090211; EP 2022086 A4 20100331; SE 0601150 L 20070703; SE 529315 C2 20070703

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20161201

2013-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130808

2013-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130702

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-03-31 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100225

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081208

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS