Global Patent Index - EP 2022141 A1

EP 2022141 A1 2009-02-11 - COMPACT PORTABLE ANTENNA FOR TERRESTRIAL DIGITAL TELEVISION

Title (en)

COMPACT PORTABLE ANTENNA FOR TERRESTRIAL DIGITAL TELEVISION

Title (de)

TRAGBARE KOMPAKTANTENNE FÜR TERRESTRISCHES DIGITALFERNSEHEN

Title (fr)

ANTENNE COMPACTE PORTABLE POUR LA TELEVISION NUMERIQUE TERRESTRE

Publication

EP 2022141 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07766007 A

Priority

  • FR 2007051227 W
  • FR 0604269 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007135313A1] The present invention relates to a compact portable antenna formed of a first element of dipole type operating in a first frequency band and comprising a first and at least one second (21) conducting arm, which are fed (3) in differential mode, the first arm or cold arm forming at least one hood for an electronic card and the second arm or hot arm consisting of a U-shaped conducting element (21) made on an insulating substrate. Moreover, a radiating element (4) with meanders (41) is made between the branches of the U-shaped element and it is dimensioned so as to operate in a second frequency band.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/30 (2006.01); H01Q 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/30 (2013.01); H01Q 1/24 (2013.01); H01Q 1/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007135313A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

FR 2901063 A1 20071116; CN 101443959 A 20090527; CN 101443959 B 20130130; EP 2022141 A1 20090211; EP 2022141 B1 20120425; JP 2009537086 A 20091022; JP 5015236 B2 20120829; KR 101337403 B1 20131206; KR 20090014270 A 20090209; US 2009096697 A1 20090416; US 7924236 B2 20110412; WO 2007135313 A1 20071129

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180517

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602007022275

- Representative's name: HOFSTETTER, SCHURACK & PARTNER PATENT- UND REC, DE

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-05-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-05-29 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007022275

- Effective date: 20130128

2013-04-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130128

2012-06-21 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007022275

- Effective date: 20120621

2012-05-23 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2012-04-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-02-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING

2009-06-03 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-06-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081020

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS