Global Patent Index - EP 2022196 A1

EP 2022196 A1 2009-02-11 - METHOD FOR UPDATING AND METHOD FOR CHECKING AN UPDATE OF AT LEAST ONE DATA ELEMENT IN A DATA CAROUSEL, AND AN ASSOCIATED FIRST DEVICE, SECOND DEVICE, AND DATA FLOW

Title (en)

METHOD FOR UPDATING AND METHOD FOR CHECKING AN UPDATE OF AT LEAST ONE DATA ELEMENT IN A DATA CAROUSEL, AND AN ASSOCIATED FIRST DEVICE, SECOND DEVICE, AND DATA FLOW

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR AKTUALISIERUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERPRÜFUNG EINER AKTUALISIERUNG ZUMINDEST EINES DATENELEMENTS IN EINEM DATENKARUSSELL, SOWIE DAZUGEHÖRIGE ERSTE VORRICHTUNG, ZWEITE VORRICHTUNG UND EINEN DATENSTROM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE MISE A JOUR ET PROCEDE DE CONTROLE D'UNE MISE A JOUR D'AU MOINS UN ELEMENT DE DONNEE DANS UN CARROUSEL DE DONNEES, AINSI QUE LE PREMIER DISPOSITIF, LE DEUXIEME DISPOSITIF ET UN FLUX DE DONNEES CORRESPONDANTS

Publication

EP 2022196 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07728954 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054502 W
  • DE 102006022704 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131927A1] The invention relates to a method and a first device for updating at least one data element in a data carousel, in which an updating element is added to the data carousel for at least one group of at least one data element, wherein the updating element indicates either the time of update of at least one of the data elements of the group, or a time interval for checking an update of at least one of the data elements of the group. The invention also comprises a method and a second device for checking an update of a data element in a data carousel, wherein the checking of at least one of the data elements is performed on the basis of an updating element that is added in the data carousel for at least one group of data elements. Finally, the invention comprises a data flow that has an updating element in the data carousel for at least one group of data elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/00 (2008.01); H04H 60/25 (2008.01); H04H 20/42 (2008.01); H04H 40/09 (2008.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

H04H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/25 (2013.01); H04H 20/16 (2013.01); H04H 20/426 (2013.01); H04N 21/235 (2013.01); H04N 21/23617 (2013.01); H04N 21/26291 (2013.01); H04N 21/435 (2013.01); H04H 40/09 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007131927A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006022704 A1 20071115; EP 2022196 A1 20090211; US 2010037262 A1 20100211; US 9319160 B2 20160419; WO 2007131927 A1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-22 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20160912

2016-09-12 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2013-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MOTOROLA MOBILITY LLC

2013-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2012-08-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MOTOROLA MOBILITY LLC

2012-08-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2012-02-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2012-02-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC.

2009-04-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04H 20/00 20080101AFI20090226BHEP

2009-03-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090211

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081022

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS