Global Patent Index - EP 2022241 A1

EP 2022241 A1 2009-02-11 - METHOD FOR THE OPERATION OF AN AUTOMATIC DEVICE AND CORRESPONDING COMPUTER PROGRAM, COMPUTER PROGRAMMING PRODUCT AND AUTOMATIC DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE OPERATION OF AN AUTOMATIC DEVICE AND CORRESPONDING COMPUTER PROGRAM, COMPUTER PROGRAMMING PRODUCT AND AUTOMATIC DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES AUTOMATISIERUNGSGERÄTES SOWIE KORRESPONDIERENDES COMPUTERPROGRAMM, COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT UND AUTOMATISIERUNGSGERÄT

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN APPAREIL D'AUTOMATISATION, ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE CORRESPONDANT, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET APPAREIL D'AUTOMATISATION ASSOCIÉ

Publication

EP 2022241 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06742387 A

Priority

DE 2006000910 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007137531A1] A method for the operation of an automatic device (12) is described, with which an address that is used to communicate with a remote communication subscriber (20) is determined in connection with or before setting up a communication with this remote communication subscriber (20) based on a code identifying the particular remote communication subscriber (20). In particular, the code is an address in an IPv4 format and the address that is used to communicate with the remote communication subscriber (20) is an address in an IPv6 format, so that transparent migration to a future address format, in particular IPv6, is possible even for automatic devices and applications which up to now have been designed only for processing address data in a previously common format, in particular the IPv4 format.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 29/12 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 29/12066 (2013.01); H04L 29/1233 (2013.01); H04L 61/1511 (2013.01); H04L 61/25 (2013.01); H04L 69/16 (2013.01); H04L 69/167 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137531A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007137531 A1 20071206; DE 112006003973 A5 20090430; EP 2022241 A1 20090211

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-10 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20120521

2012-05-21 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2009-06-24 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-06-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-04-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090323

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ERLMANN, MARKUS

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TALANIS, THOMAS

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081110

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU