Global Patent Index - EP 2022264 A1

EP 2022264 A1 2009-02-11 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING TTI DATA SERVICE

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING TTI DATA SERVICE

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES TTI-DATENDIENSTES

Title (fr)

SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION DE SERVICE DE DONNÉES TTI

Publication

EP 2022264 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07746431 A

Priority

  • KR 2007002278 W
  • KR 20060042108 A
  • KR 20060125140 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007129865A1] Provided are a system and method for providing a Traffic and Travel Information (TTI) data service related to a video service in digital broadcasting. A transmission device for providing a Traffic and Travel Information (TTI) data service related to a video service in digital broadcasting, the transmission device including: an encoding unit for a specific scene of a video to be broadcasted, TTI data related to a specific scene, and link data for linking the specific scene with the TTI data; and a broadcasting stream creating unit for creating a transmission stream in conformity to a broadcasting standard based on the video data, the TTI data, and the encoded and outputted link data.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/08 (2006.01); H04N 5/00 (2011.01); H04N 7/24 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 21/435 (2013.01); H04H 20/30 (2013.01); H04H 20/40 (2013.01); H04H 20/55 (2013.01); H04N 21/234318 (2013.01); H04N 21/235 (2013.01); H04N 21/41422 (2013.01); H04N 21/4307 (2013.01); H04N 21/4312 (2013.01); H04N 21/4314 (2013.01); H04N 21/4349 (2013.01); H04N 21/44012 (2013.01); H04N 21/4722 (2013.01); H04N 21/488 (2013.01); H04N 21/6112 (2013.01); H04N 21/6131 (2013.01); H04N 21/6143 (2013.01); H04N 21/8133 (2013.01); H04N 21/814 (2013.01); H04N 21/8146 (2013.01); H04N 21/816 (2013.01); H04N 21/8586 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007129865 A1 20071115; EP 2022264 A1 20090211; EP 2022264 A4 20090805; KR 100835179 B1 20080605; KR 20070109783 A 20071115

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-17 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140814

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090918

2009-08-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090706

2009-08-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 7/08 20060101AFI20080215BHEP

2009-08-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04N 7/24 20060101ALI20090630BHEP

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081201

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS