Global Patent Index - EP 2022356 A2

EP 2022356 A2 2009-02-11 - Glove having a trimming piece

Title (en)

Glove having a trimming piece

Title (de)

Handschuh mit Besatzstück

Title (fr)

Gant doté d'une pièce de garniture

Publication

EP 2022356 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08014247 A

Priority

DE 102007037315 A

Abstract (en)

The glove (1) has a trimming piece (3) i.e. part of a closure unit, arranged on a glove exterior. An upper surface of the trimming piece is made up of a precious metal i.e. gold. The trimming piece includes a molded body. The trimming piece serves for labeling, individualizing and identifying the glove or a wearer of the glove. The trimming piece is affixed on a back of the glove or on a back of a wrist. The trimming piece serves for regulation of fitting accuracy, for attachment of the glove to an item of clothing and/or an accessory.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Handschuh (1), insbesondere Sporthandschuh mit einem Besatzstück (3) aus Edelmetall auf der Handschuhaußenseite bereitgestellt, insbesondere Gold. Die erfindungsgemäße Lösung besteht dabei auf dem überraschenden Befund, daß Sportler, die Handschuhe mit einem aus Gold gefertigten Besatzstück tragen, im Bereich des Hautkontakts seltener unter Hautirritation, Entzündigen, Ausschlag oder anderen Infektionen der Haut leiden als Träger von Handschuhen mit einem Besatzstück aus bisher verwendeten Materialen.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41F 1/06 (2006.01); A41D 19/015 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41F 1/06 (2013.01); A41D 19/01594 (2013.01); A63B 71/141 (2013.01); A63B 71/143 (2013.01); A63B 71/146 (2013.01); A63B 2209/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022356 A2 20090211; EP 2022356 A3 20151125; EP 2022356 B1 20180411; DE 102007037315 A1 20090226; DK 2022356 T3 20180528; US 2009038050 A1 20090212

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Effective date: 20180524

2018-05-03 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008016018

2018-05-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2018-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER AND PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG, CH

2018-04-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 987368 T

- Effective date: 20180415

2018-04-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2018-04-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-11-29 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20171030

2017-11-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A41D 19/015 20060101ALI20170928BHEP

2017-11-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A41F 1/06 20060101ALI20170928BHEP

2017-11-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A63B 71/14 20060101AFI20170928BHEP

2017-09-28 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 502008016018

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A41F0001060000

- IPC: A63B0071140000

2017-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20170125

2016-08-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2016-08-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: RS

2016-08-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: MK

2016-08-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: AL

2016-08-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: BA

2016-07-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20160525

2016-07-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2015-11-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2015-11-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2015-11-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A41D 19/015 20060101ALI20151021BHEP

2015-11-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A41F 1/06 20060101AFI20151021BHEP

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS