Global Patent Index - EP 2022363 A2

EP 2022363 A2 2009-02-11 - Container for a cosmetic preparation

Title (en)

Container for a cosmetic preparation

Title (de)

Behälter zur Aufnahme eines Kosmetikums

Title (fr)

Récipient destiné à la réception d'un cosmétique

Publication

EP 2022363 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08007033 A

Priority

  • EP 07015561 A
  • EP 08007033 A

Abstract (en)

The container (1) has a container body (10) and a bottom (11) connected together by a fixed and liquid-tight connection (12) and forming a two-part structure of the container. The connection is provided as a welding connection. A transparent and translucent material is provided as container material. The container base body includes an inner wall with structures (3, 13), where the parts are formed as plastic-injection molded parts, respectively. The bottom is provided with a container opening. A marking is provided in a man part of the container for position determination.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfmdung betrifft einen Behälter (1) zur Aufnahme eines flüssigen Kosmetikums, insbesondere eines farbigen Kosmetikums für die Lippen, Augenlider, Fingernägel oder dergleichen. Als Behältermaterial ist ein transparentes oder transluzentes Material vorgesehen. Der Behälter ist zweiteilig mit einem ersten Behälterteil (10) und einem zweiten Behälterteil (11) aufgebaut, wobei das erste und das zweite Behälterteil (10, 11) fest und flüssigkeitsdicht miteinander verbunden sind. Das erste Behälterteil (10) weist eine Innenwand (5) mit einer Strukturierung (3; 13) auf.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/00 (2006.01); A45C 11/00 (2006.01); A45D 34/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/00 (2013.01); A45C 11/00 (2013.01); A45D 2040/0012 (2013.01); A45D 2200/053 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022363 A2 20090211; EP 2022363 A3 20130828; US 2009039115 A1 20090212; US 8083092 B2 20111227

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-05-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-04-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2013-08-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A45C 11/00 20060101ALI20130723BHEP

2013-08-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A45D 40/00 20060101AFI20130723BHEP

2013-08-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A45D 34/00 20060101ALI20130723BHEP

2011-08-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HARTSTOCK, KARL

2010-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEKA GMBH

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS