Global Patent Index - EP 2022372 A1

EP 2022372 A1 2009-02-11 - Slatted frame with lumbar support

Title (en)

Slatted frame with lumbar support

Title (de)

Lattenrost mit Lordosenstütze

Title (fr)

Sommier à lattes doté d'un soutien lombaire

Publication

EP 2022372 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08160081 A

Priority

DE 202007011156 U

Abstract (en)

Slatted frame comprises a frame (1) with slats (3) and a lying region (5) corresponding to the lordosis region of a person so that high compression of a mattress in this lying region is achieved with uniform loading of the mattress. Preferred Features: The slats of the lying region are partially raised compared with the lying regions next to the lying region.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Lattenrost für eine Matratze (2) mit einem Rahmen (1) und mehreren an dem Rahmen gelagerten Latten (3, 3', 3"), ist wenigstens eine Latte (3) und/oder deren Lagerung eines bestimmten Liegebereichs (5) der durch den Lattenrost vorgegebenen Liegefläche, der in etwa in dem Bereich der Lordose einer auf der Matratze liegenden Person angeordnet ist oder entspricht, so ausgestaltet, dass bei gleichmäßiger Belastung der Matratze (2) über die Liegefläche eine höhere Kompression der Matratze in diesem Liegebereich (5) gegenüber benachbarten Liegebereichen erreicht wird.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/067 (2013.01); A47C 23/063 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202007011156 U1 20081224; EP 2022372 A1 20090211

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130201

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-07-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090619

2009-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090520

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS