Global Patent Index - EP 2022373 A2

EP 2022373 A2 2009-02-11 - Mattress

Title (en)

Mattress

Title (de)

Matratze

Title (fr)

Matelas

Publication

EP 2022373 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08013713 A

Priority

DE 202007010747 U

Abstract (en)

The mattress has a base body (11), which comprises different layers such as a fuselage layer (13) and a head layer (12) and/or a foot layer (14), where the base body comprises several retainers (20). Filling units are arranged inside the retainers. A fluid is filled inside the retainers. A large retainer (21) is provided for a large filling unit in the fuselage layer, while the head layer and/or the foot layer comprises one or more small retainers (22) for small filling units.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Matratze (10) mit einem Basiskörper (11), welcher verschiedene Bereiche aufweist, nämlich mindestens einen Rumpfbereich (13) und einen Kopfbereich (12) und/oder einen Fußbereich (14). Der Basiskörper (11) weist mehrere Aufnahmen (20) auf, in welchen Füllelemente angeordnet werden können, welche mit einem Fluid befüllbar sind. Im Rumpfbereich (13) ist eine große Aufnahme (21) für ein großes Füllelement (Rumpffüllelement) vorgesehen. Der Kopf (12) und/oder der Fußbereich (14) weist eine oder mehrere kleinere Aufnahmen (22) für kleinere Füllelemente auf (Fig. 1).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/08 (2006.01); A47C 27/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/085 (2013.01); A47C 21/048 (2013.01); A61G 7/057 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202007010747 U1 20070927; EP 2022373 A2 20090211; EP 2022373 A3 20090722

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-08-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100123

2010-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-07-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-07-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS