Global Patent Index - EP 2022456 A2

EP 2022456 A2 2009-02-11 - Portable navigation device

Title (en)

Portable navigation device

Title (de)

Tragbares Navigationsgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de navigation portatif

Publication

EP 2022456 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08104592 A

Priority

DE 102007037520 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a direction determination device (101) for determining a moving direction, and a cartography device (103) for combining the moving direction with cartographic information. The cartographic device is designed to detect an obstacle e.g. crossroad and wall, in the moving direction. An indication device (105) is provided for outputting an indication signal when the cartographic device detects the obstacle in the moving direction, where the signal is an acoustical warning signal or vibration warning signal. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) a navigation method under usage of a portable navigation device (2) a computer program for executing a navigation method (3) a programmatically installed device for executing a navigation method.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein tragbares Navigationsgerät mit einer Richtungsbestimmungseinrichtung (101) zum Bestimmen einer Bewegungsrichtung des tragbaren Navigationsgerätes, einer Kartografieeinrichtung (103) zum Verknüpfen der Bewegungsrichtung mit kartografischer Information, wobei die Kartografieeinrichtung (103) ferner ausgebildet ist, ein Hindernis in der Bewegungsrichtung zu erkennen und einer Hinweiseinrichtung (105) zum Ausgeben eines Hinweissignals, falls die Kartografieeinrichtung (103) ein Hindernis in der Bewegungsrichtung erkannt hat.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 3/06 (2006.01); G01C 21/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 3/061 (2013.01); G01C 21/20 (2013.01); A61H 2003/063 (2013.01); A61H 2003/065 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19926367 A1 20001214 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022456 A2 20090211; EP 2022456 A3 20090506; CN 101363738 A 20090211; DE 102007037520 A1 20090212

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-05-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091107

2010-01-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-05-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61H 3/06 20060101AFI20081110BHEP

2009-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01C 21/20 20060101ALI20090330BHEP

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS