Global Patent Index - EP 2022568 A2

EP 2022568 A2 2009-02-11 - Machine for painting and pattern printing on flat rigid panels

Title (en)

Machine for painting and pattern printing on flat rigid panels

Title (de)

Lackier- und Dessindruckmaschine für harte Flachplatten

Title (fr)

Machine pour le vernissage et l'impression à dessin sur plaques rigides et planes

Publication

EP 2022568 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08104517 A

Priority

IT VI20070226 A

Abstract (en)

Herein described is a machine for painting and pattern printing on flat rigid panels, made of glass, metal, wood, plastic and other types of material, of the type in which the panel (1) is arranged on a transport organ (2) usually made up of a rotating cylinder or a sliding belt, arranged oppositely positioned with respect to a painting cylinder (3), which deposits the paint on the underlying panel transported by the abovementioned moveable belt/cylinder. The machine is characterised in that the painting cylinder (3) in absence of the underlying panel (1) is arranged at a distance exceeding the thickness of the panel itself and that, at the beginning of the painting or pattern printing operation, the abovementioned painting cylinder is arranged in contact with the panel moving forward, covering its entire width, in a manner orthogonal to the direction of forward movement of the panel and in a predetermined position, regardless of the thickness of the panel to be painted.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 1/08 (2006.01); B05C 1/02 (2006.01); B05C 1/16 (2006.01); B05C 11/10 (2006.01); B28B 11/00 (2006.01); B28B 11/04 (2006.01); B41F 17/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 11/1021 (2013.01); B05C 1/025 (2013.01); B05C 1/027 (2013.01); B28B 11/046 (2013.01); B41F 17/26 (2013.01); B41F 33/16 (2013.01); B05C 1/0826 (2013.01); B05C 1/083 (2013.01); B05C 1/165 (2013.01); B28B 11/04 (2013.01); B41M 1/04 (2013.01); B41M 1/06 (2013.01); B41M 1/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022568 A2 20090211; EP 2022568 A3 20100630; IT VI20070226 A1 20090208

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-04-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2011-04-21 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20110208

2011-03-09 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2010-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2010-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B05C 1/08 20060101AFI20081125BHEP

2010-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B05C 11/10 20060101ALI20100527BHEP

2010-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B05C 1/16 20060101ALI20100527BHEP

2010-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B05C 1/02 20060101ALI20100527BHEP

2010-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B28B 11/00 20060101ALI20100527BHEP

2010-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B28B 11/04 20060101ALI20100527BHEP

2010-06-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41F 17/26 20060101ALI20100527BHEP

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS